IL HR0229 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Central Management Services (i) to compile a list of members of State boards and commissions who receive healthcare benefits through the State Employees Group Insurance Plan and (ii) to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly within 30 days after the adoption of the resolution.
Title
CMS-LIST BOARD & COMM INSUREDS
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Timothy Schmitz [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-04-11 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-04-11 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=229&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0229.htm |