IL HR0216 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 24 to 28, 2017 as the inaugural, "Illinois Distracted Driving Awareness Week".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISTRACTED DRIVING WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-28HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback