IL HR0214 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 113-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 113-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a management audit of the Department of Human Services' process for selecting Independent Service Coordination agencies for the Fiscal Year commencing July 1, 2019.
Title
AUDIT-DHS-ISC
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |