IL HR0196 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March of 2017 as "Irish American Heritage Month".
Title
IRISH AMERICAN MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-11 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-28 | House | Assigned to Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=196&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0196.htm |