IL HR0191 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President Donald Trump and Congress to cease their efforts to repeal the Affordable Care Act.
Title
AFFORDABLE CARE ACT - RETAIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 003-002-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=191&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0191.htm |