IL HR0168 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States support for veterans currently struggling with mental illness and thoughts of suicide and encourages the State of Illinois to create a memorial for veterans who have died of suicide to be included at Oak Ridge Cemetery.
Title
VETERAN SUICIDE-OAK RIDGE
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Rep. Lance Yednock [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-02 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-03-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=168&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0168.htm |