IL HR0158 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the death of Dean Sweitzer.
Title
MEMORIAL - DEAN SWEITZER
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-02-18 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2015-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2015-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=158&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0158.htm |