IL HR0139 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Fair and Equitable Assessment of Property Task Force.
Title
PROPERTY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-06-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-06-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-06-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-03-16 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=139&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0139.htm |