IL HR0128 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares August 4, 2017 and August 4, 2018 as "President Barack Obama Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
PRES. OBAMA DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=128&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0128.htm |