IL HR0126 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the City of Chicago to rename Trump Tower Plaza after U.S. Marine Lance Corporal Jose Gutierrez.
Title
LCPL. GUTIERREZ-TRUMP PLAZA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=126&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0126.htm |