IL HR0116 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for improved adolescent health and wellness by recognizing the importance of an adolescent well visit to prevent chronic diseases, help better diagnosis and treat chronic diseases, and update immunizations.
Title
ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND WELLNESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=116&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0116.htm |