IL HR0088 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the federal government to monitor the ever-increasing costs of prescription drugs and to take any necessary action to reduce the out-of-pocket expenses for those purchasing medications.
Title
PRESCRIPT DRUGS COST - FEDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=88&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0088.htm |