IL HR0078 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges continued funding of Planned Parenthood by the U.S. Congress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PLANNED PARENTHOOD - FUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback