IL HR0074 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States that Illinois Breast and Cervical Cancer Program eligibility and funding should be broadened to further reduce barriers to breast screening, detection and treatment for underserved women to improve conditions for women to achieve optimal health, regardless of their race, ethnicity, or economic status.
Title
BREAST CANCER PROGRAM FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-02 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=74&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0074.htm |