IL HR0073 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the death of Anthony "Tony" J. Leone Jr.
Title
MEMORIAL-ANTHONY LEONE
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=73&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0073.htm |