IL HR0073 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the members of the Illinois congressional delegation to vote against the F-35 alternate engine appropriations measure.
Title
IL CONG - F-35 ENGINE APPROP
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-03-10 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Armed Forces & Military Affairs Committee; 005-000-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Armed Forces & Military Affairs Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=73&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0073.htm |