IL HR0064 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the citizens of Illinois to increase their understanding of endometriosis and urges the General Assembly to pursue legislation to provide more comprehensive coverage for this frequently misdiagnosed debilitating condition.
Title
ENDOMETRIOSIS AWARENESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=64&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0064.htm |