IL HR0059 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the months of November 2015 and November 2016 as Veterans Appreciation Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
VETERANS APPRECIATION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-03 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-02-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 022-000-000 |
2015-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0059.htm |