IL HR0057 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Calls upon the Governor to remember the importance of the arts throughout the budgeting process. Calls upon elected officials and schools throughout the State of Illinois to maintain art programs.
Title
ARTS EDUCATION FUNDING
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution Adopted 099-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancements Committee; 009-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancements Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |