IL HR0040 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of 2017 as "Dysautonomia Awareness Month" in the State of Illinois.
Title
DYSAUTONOMIA AWARENESS MNTH
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-02-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=40&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0040.htm |