IL HR0035 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Finds that enforcement of the Employment of Illinois Workers on Public Works Act furthers a compelling State interest and directs the Illinois Department of Labor to enforce the Act.
Title
WORKERS-PUB WORKS - DEP. LABOR
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-02-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=35&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0035.htm |