IL HR0016 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Calls on the U.S. Congress to authorize a policy change to allow existing interstates built with federal funding to become state tollways, enabling Illinois to convert the Dan Ryan Expressway I-57 into a toll road for the safety of its citizens.
Title
DAN RYAN-TOLL ROAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=16&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0016.htm |