IL HR0013 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of March in 2017 and 2018 as Ask Your Boss for a Raise Month.
Title
ASK YOUR BOSS FOR RAISE MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-02-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=13&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0013.htm |