IL HJRCA0051 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that an additional income tax shall be imposed on individuals in an amount equal to 3% of the portion of the individual's income that is greater than $1,000,000 for the taxable year. Provides that the revenue collected from the tax shall be distributed to school districts on a per pupil basis. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
REVENUE-EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-03 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 |
2014-04-03 | House | Held on the Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Read in Full a Third Time |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Read in Full a Second Time |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-004-000 |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-03-20 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2014-03-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=51&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJRCA/09800HC0051.htm |