IL HJRCA0044 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Suffrage and Elections Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for the recall of all State Executive Branch officers and members of the General Assembly. Changes the signature requirements for affidavits and petitions for recall of the Governor and expands them to include all State Executive Branch officers and members of the General Assembly. Proposes to amend the Local Government Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for the recall of all elected officials of any school district, community college, or unit of local government. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-RECALL ALL OFFICIALS
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2016-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-01-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-01-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2016-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=44&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0044.htm |