IL HJRCA0044 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution. Eliminates the Offices of the Comptroller and Treasurer. Provides instead for a single Comptroller of the Treasury. Provides that the Comptroller of the Treasury shall (i) maintain the State's central fiscal accounts and order payments into and out of the funds held by him or her, (ii) be responsible for the safekeeping and investment of monies and securities deposited with him or her, and for their disbursement upon his or her order, and (iii) have the duties and powers that may be prescribed by law. No Comptroller or Treasurer shall be elected in 2018 and thereafter. Effective otherwise upon conclusion of the terms of the Comptroller and the Treasurer elected in 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPTROLLER OF THE TREASURY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-03HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 46
2014-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross
2014-02-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-02-05HouseRead in Full a First Time
2014-02-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback