IL HJRCA0040 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Creates the Independent Redistricting Commission to adopt and file with the Secretary of State a redistricting plan for Legislative and Representative Districts. Provides for the selection of Commissioners and establishes the authority of a Special Commissioner to design a redistricting plan in the event that the Commission fails to properly adopt and file a redistricting plan. Effective beginning with redistricting in 2021 and applies to members elected in 2022 and thereafter.
Title
CONAMEND-LEGISLATIVE REDISTRCT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2015-05-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-05-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=40&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0040.htm |