IL HJRCA0032 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the oath of office for each prospective holder of a State office shall include an affirmation to protect and honor the diversity of the people of Illinois. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-OATH OF OFFICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-04-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-03-17HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-03-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback