IL HJRCA0030 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution to provide that (i) the proclamation of results of each election of members of the General Assembly must take place as soon as practical after the general election, but in no case later than seven days prior to the date the General Assembly first convenes, (ii) the General Assembly shall convene each year on the second Wednesday of December, and (iii) the General Assembly may not be in session in any general election year from the date of the general election until the second Wednesday of December, except upon a joint proclamation stating the purpose of the session. Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution to provide that (i) the proclamation of results of each election of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor must take place as soon as practical after the general election, but in no case later than seven days prior to the date the General Assembly first convenes in accordance with specified provisions and (ii) the Governor and Lieutenant Governor shall hold office for four years beginning on the second Wednesday of December. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-GA/GOV TAKE OFFICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=30&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0030.htm |