IL HJRCA0024 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Bill of Rights Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that people have a right to hunt and fish as it is a valued part of our heritage and shall be forever preserved for the public good.
Title
CONAMEND-RIGHT TO HUNT & FISH
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-03 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 |
2013-03-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=24&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJRCA/09800HC0024.htm |