IL HJRCA0019 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a person may not be elected to the office of State Senator or State Representative for terms totaling more than 12 years in each house or a combined total of 24 years in each house. Provides that service prior to the date of the adoption of the amendment shall be considered in the calculation of a person's service. Provides that any person in office at the time of the adoption of the amendment who exceeds the specified term limitation shall be allowed to complete his or her current term of office. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-GA TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback