IL HJRCA0017 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Creates the Independent Redistricting Commission to adopt and file with the Secretary of State a redistricting plan for Legislative and Representative Districts. Provides for the selection of Commissioners and establishes the authority of a Special Commissioner to design a redistricting plan in the event that the Commission fails to properly adopt and file a redistricting plan. Effective beginning with redistricting in 2021 and applies to members elected in 2022 and thereafter.
Title
CONAMEND-LEGISLATIVE REDISTRCT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=17&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJRCA/10000HC0017.htm |