IL HJRCA0016 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that no moneys, including bond proceeds, derived from taxes, fees, excises, or licenses relating to licensing, carrying, or possession of firearms or firearm ammunition or related to the use of firearms or firearm ammunition shall be expended for purposes other than the following: the costs of administering and enforcing laws related to firearms and firearm ammunition; and, with respect to local governments, other firearm and firearm ammunition regulation purposes as authorized by law. Provides that the costs of administering laws related to firearms and firearm ammunition shall be limited to direct program expenses related to the following: the enforcement of firearm and firearm ammunition regulation laws; the safety of persons from unlawful use of firearms or firearm ammunition; or the regulation of the carrying of firearms. Provides that the limitations to the costs of administering laws related to firearms and firearm ammunition shall also include direct program expenses related to workers' compensation claims for death or injury of employees enforcing firearm and firearm ammunition laws and investigations for improving the safety of the employees enforcing those laws. Provides that none of the revenues described in these provisions shall, by transfer, offset, or otherwise, be diverted to any purpose other than those described in these provisions. Provides that investment income that is attributable to the investment of moneys in funds used for the regulation of firearms and firearm ammunition shall be retained in those funds for the uses specified in these provisions. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-FIREARM REG FUNDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback