IL HJRCA0016 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Finance Article of the Illinois Constitution relating to balanced budgets. Provides that the State budget shall be based on estimated revenue (now funds), defines "revenue". Provides that, except for deficiency or emergency appropriations, appropriations are expendable only during the fiscal year for which they were appropriated. Provides that the General Assembly by law may establish an extended period to pay lapsed appropriations, not to exceed six months beyond the end of the fiscal year.
Title
CONAMEND-BALANCED BUDGET
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] |
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=16&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJRCA/10000HC0016.htm |