IL HJRCA0012 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution. Eliminates the Office of the Comptroller. Transfers the duties of the Comptroller to the Treasurer. Provides that the Treasurer shall (i) maintain the State's central fiscal accounts and order payments into and out of the funds held by him or her, (ii) be responsible for the safekeeping and investment of monies and securities deposited with him or her, and for their disbursement upon his or her order, and (iii) have the duties and powers that may be prescribed by law. Provides that no Comptroller shall be elected in 2026 and thereafter. Effective otherwise upon conclusion of the term of the Comptroller elected in 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-OFFICE OF COMPTROLLER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2021-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2021-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback