IL HJRCA0001 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-13)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-13)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Bill of Rights Article of the Illinois Constitution concerning crime victim's rights. Provides that in addition to other rights provided in the Constitutional provision, a crime victim has the right to: (1) be free from harassment, intimidation, and abuse; (2) refuse to disclose information that is privileged or confidential by law; (3) timely notification of all court proceedings; (4) be heard at any proceeding involving a post-arraignment release decision, plea, sentencing, post-conviction or post-adjudication release decision, and any post-arraignment proceeding in which a right of the victim is at issue; (5) receive a report related to the defendant's sentence when available to the accused; and (6) have the safety of the victim and the victim's family considered in denying or fixing the amount of bail, determining whether to release the defendant, and setting conditions of release after arrest and conviction. Provides that a victim, victim's lawyer, or the prosecuting attorney may assert the victim's constitutional rights in court. Provides that nothing in this Constitutional provision creates any cause of action for compensation or damages against the State, any political subdivision of the State, any officer, employee, or agent of the State or of any of its political subdivisions, or any officer or employee of the court. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CRIME VICTIMS RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Amendment in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Amendment in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-10 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read in Full a Third Time |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2014; Constitutional Amendments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read in Full a Second Time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2014; Constitutional Amendments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read in Full a First Time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2014; Constitutional Amendments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-02 | House | Read in Full a Third Time - As Amended |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Read in Full a Second Time - As Amended |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Read in Full a First Time - As Amended |
2014-03-26 | House | Recalled to the Order of First Reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 013-001-001 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2012-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |