IL HJR0129 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Assigned to Aging Committee
Pending: House Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares September 22, 2018 as "Falls Prevention Awareness Day" in the State of Illinois. Urges older Illinoisans to take control of their health and prevent falls. Commends the Illinois Falls Prevention Coalition, healthcare professionals, and community-based organizations for offering falls risk screenings, educational workshops to address concerns about falls, and exercise programs to enable older adults to improve their strength and balance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FALLS PREVENTION AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Aging Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback