IL HJR0125 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-21 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-21 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to commence a procurement process for a project to provide additional highway capacity along Interstate 55 from Interstate 355 to Interstate 90/Interstate 94 in DuPage, Cook, and Will Counties, and toll the additional capacity pursuant to the authority provided under the Public-Private Partnerships for Transportation Act.
Title
IDOT-INTERSTATE PROJECT AUTH
Sponsors
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=125&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0125.htm |