IL HJR0111 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-20 - Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-20 - Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Interstate 255 within the city limits of Cahokia as the "Monroe L. Flinn Memorial Highway" in honor of former State Representative Flinn and his accomplishments.
Title
MONROE FLINN MEM HWY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-20 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-11-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-11-06 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |