IL HJR0108 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-19 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-19 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates the Loyola University Chicago men's volleyball team on winning the 2014 Midwest Intercollegiate Volleyball Association Tournament and its achievements over the 2013 and 2014 seasons.
Title
CONGRATS - LOYOLA MENS VOLLEY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-19 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2014-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-11-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-10-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=108&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0108.htm |