IL HJR0107 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the General Assembly to promptly review and evaluate the Report on Waiver of School Code Mandates filed by the State Board of Education to determine if the Report should be disapproved in whole or in part.
Title
SCH CD MANDATE WAIVER REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 047-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-11-20 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 109-000-000 |
2014-11-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-11-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-11-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-000-002 |
2014-11-06 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-10-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |