IL HJR0100 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Old US 50 in Clinton as the "Veterans Memorial Road."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS MEMORIAL ROAD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-11-20SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 114-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback