IL HJR0097 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Designate the section of Illinois Route 78 in Mason County from the Illinois River in the City of Havana to the Sangamon River in the township of Lynchburg as the "Sgt. Don H. Lascelles Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SGT. D. LASCELLES MEM HIGHWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-05-28SenateResolution Adopted; 051-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-10SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-08HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 111-000-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-25HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback