IL HJR0095 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Illinois schools to provide education for all students in grades six to 12 on how to identify, understand, and respond to signs of addictions and mental illnesses, as well as provide instruction for how to help someone who is developing a mental health problem or experiencing a mental health crisis. Commends the National Council for Behavioral Health and the Illinois Association for Behavioral Health for their work in developing and directing teen Mental Health First Aid training programs for schools. Commends Amos Alonzo Stagg High School, the Paris Union School District, and Clinton High School for participating in the first nationwide pilot programs of teen Mental Health First Aid training for schools. Commends Operation Snowball, the Human Resources Center of Edgar and Clark Counties, and the Heritage Behavioral Health Center for participating in the first nationwide teen Mental Health First Aid instructor trainings.
Title
TEEN MENTAL HEALTH-SUPPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 015-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-12-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=95&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0095.htm |