IL HJR0092 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the overpass in Crainville along Wolf Creek Road over Illinois Route 13 as the "Veterans Memorial Overpass".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS MEMORIAL OVERPASS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-16SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-08HouseResolution Adopted 111-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback