IL HJR0084 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Congressional Delegation to co-sponsor H.R. 96 and support it in any manner possible to ensure that our veterans receive the proper and sufficient dental care that they deserve.
Title
VETERANS-DENTAL CARE
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 015-000-000 |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-09-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-09-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-09-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=84&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0084.htm |