IL HJR0074 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
US CONST-ART V-APPLICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=74&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJR/10200HJ0074.htm |