IL HJR0064 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-NINTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Friday, April 17, 2015, it stands adjourned until Monday, April 20, 2015 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, April 16, 2015, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 21, 2015, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Don Harmon; 3-6(a) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=64&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0064.htm |