IL HJR0063 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Calls upon the State of Illinois and its operating units, including but not limited to the Department of Central Management Services, to immediately suspend the drafting, negotiation, perfection, and signing of any lease on any parcel of real property, and that this suspension is to continue until the conclusion of the audit of the Department of Human Services currently being conducted under the supervision of the Legislative Audit Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NEW STATE LEASES - HALT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-06-28HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-06-28SenateResolution Adopted; 046-000-000
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2017-06-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-06-25HouseResolution Adopted as Amended
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-06-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-06-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-31HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-30HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-30HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-30HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback