IL HJR0059 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of road on Interstate 94 from mile marker 16.50 to mile marker 17 as the "Trooper Gerald W. Ellis Memorial Highway".
Title
TROOPER GERALD ELLIS HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor All Senators |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |